House | 04/28/2025 | Referred to Public Education | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Passed | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1490 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1490 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1456 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1262 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Referred to Education K-16 | Journal Page: 537 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 537 | |
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |