House | 05/05/2025 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Referred to s/c on Family & Fiduciary Relationships by Speaker | Journal Page: 1638 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1643 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1555 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1360 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1360 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1360 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1360 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Laid before the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 985 | |
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 538 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 538 | |
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |