House | 04/30/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2035 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2035 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1836 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1438 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Passed | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1426 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1426 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1390 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1390 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1389 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 548 | |
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 548 | |
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |