House
|
03/25/2025
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 622
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA5 Nichols
|
Journal Page: 621
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Point of order
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered FA4 Eckhardt
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered FA2 Middleton
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 503
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2025
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2025
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2025
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 294
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|