Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1902 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Nichols, et al. S.B. No. 1902
1+By: Nichols S.B. No. 1902
2+ (In the Senate - Filed March 4, 2025; March 6, 2025, read
3+ first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
4+ March 13, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9,
5+ Nays 0; March 13, 2025, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
49
510
611 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
712 AN ACT
813 relating to the administration of the dealer-issued license plates
914 database and to the removal and transfer of license plates.
1015 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1116 SECTION 1. Section 503.0633(f), Transportation Code, as
1217 effective July 1, 2025, is amended to read as follows:
1318 (f) If the department determines that a dealer is
1419 fraudulently obtaining license plates or sets of license plates or
1520 fraudulently using the database of dealer-issued license plates, or
1621 has been denied access to the temporary tag database under former
1722 Section 503.0632(f), the department may, after giving notice
1823 electronically and by certified mail to the dealer, deny access to
1924 the database of dealer-issued license plates to the dealer. A
2025 dealer denied access to the database of dealer-issued license
2126 plates under this subsection may request a hearing on the denial as
2227 provided by Subchapter O, Chapter 2301, Occupations Code.
2328 SECTION 2. Section 504.901, Transportation Code, as
2429 effective July 1, 2025, is amended to read as follows:
2530 Sec. 504.901. REMOVAL AND TRANSFER OF LICENSE PLATES. (a)
2631 On the sale or transfer of a motor vehicle to a dealer who holds a
2732 general distinguishing number issued under Chapter 503, the dealer
2833 shall remove each license plate issued for the motor vehicle. The
2934 dealer shall transfer each removed license plate to a motor vehicle
3035 if that motor vehicle is purchased from the dealer and the license
3136 plates are appropriate for the class of vehicle to which the plates
3237 are being transferred [Each license plate issued for the motor
3338 vehicle shall be assigned to a subsequent purchaser of the motor
3439 vehicle at retail sale as required by Section 503.063].
3540 (b) On the sale or transfer of a motor vehicle to a person
3641 who does not hold a general distinguishing number issued under
3742 Chapter 503, the seller shall remove each license plate issued for
3843 the motor vehicle. The removed license plates may be transferred to
3944 another vehicle titled in the seller's name if the license plates
4045 are appropriate for the class of vehicle to which the plates are
4146 being transferred and the seller obtains:
4247 (1) the department's approval of an application to
4348 transfer the license plates; and
4449 (2) a new registration insignia for [shall remain
4550 with] the motor vehicle.
4651 (c) A license plate removed from [(b-1) The purchaser of] a
4752 motor vehicle that is not transferred to another motor vehicle must
4853 be disposed of in a manner prescribed by the department not later
4954 than the 10th day after the date the license plate is removed from
5055 the motor vehicle [may request replacement license plates under
5156 Section 504.007].
5257 SECTION 3. Not later than October 1, 2025, the Texas
5358 Department of Motor Vehicles shall adopt rules as necessary to
5459 implement or administer the changes in law made by this Act.
5560 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect July 1, 2025, if this Act
5661 receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each
5762 house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.
5863 If this Act does not receive the vote necessary to take effect on
5964 that date, this Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
65+ * * * * *