House | 05/05/2025 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Referred to s/c on Family & Fiduciary Relationships by Speaker | Journal Page: 1822 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1833 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1738 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1406 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1387 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1387 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1387 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1387 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1387 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1387 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Amended | Journal Page: 1387 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 West | Journal Page: 1386 |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Amendment(s) offered FA1 West | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1386 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1386 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1403 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | Journal Page: 1362 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1033 | |
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 553 | |
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 553 | |
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |