House | 04/30/2025 | Referred to s/c on Juvenile Justice by Speaker | Journal Page: 2456 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2456 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1554 | |
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1528 | |
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1528 | |
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1528 | |
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1528 | |
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1528 | |
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Amended | Journal Page: 1528 | |
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | FA3 West | Journal Page: 1527 |
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1525 | |
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 985 | |
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Referred to Education K-16 | Journal Page: 553 | |
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 553 | |
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |