House | 04/22/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1652 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1652 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1564 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1368 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1361 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1361 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1361 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1361 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1366 | |
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 558 | |
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 558 | |
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |