Senate | 05/08/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 05/06/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/06/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/06/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1799 | |
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 559 | |
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 559 | |
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |