|
05/03/2025
|
Effective on 9/1/25
|
|
|
E
|
04/29/2025
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1609
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2025
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1548
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1825
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 1484
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Point of order overruled
|
|
Journal Page: 1484
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Point of order
|
|
Journal Page: 1483
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1483
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1462
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1371
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Record vote RV#300
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1558
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1558
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Additional sponsor(s) authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1558
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1558
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1521
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1521
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Record vote RV#285
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Amendment tabled
|
44-Rodrguez Ramos
|
Journal Page: 1520
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Record vote RV#284
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Amendment tabled 44-Rodríguez Ramos
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Amendment tabled 43-Rodríguez Ramos
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Amendment tabled 42-Rodríguez Ramos
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Amendment tabled 41-Rodríguez Ramos
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Amendment tabled 40-Rodríguez Ramos
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Amendment tabled 39-Rodríguez Ramos
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Amendment tabled 38-Rodríguez Ramos
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Amendment tabled 37-Wu
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Amendment tabled 36-J. Jones
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Amendment tabled 35-J. Jones
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Amendment tabled 34-Zwiener
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Amendment tabled 33-Turner
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Amendment tabled 32-Wu
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Amendment tabled 31-Morales Shaw
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Amendment tabled 30-Rose
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Amendment tabled 29-Moody
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Amendment tabled
|
28-Goodwin
|
Journal Page: 1505
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Amendment tabled 28-Goodwin
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Amendment tabled 27-V. Perez
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Amendment tabled 26-Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Amendment tabled 25-J. González
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Amendment tabled 24-Allen
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Amendment tabled 23-Reynolds
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Amendment tabled 22-Reynolds
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Amendment tabled 21-Bryant
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Amendment tabled 20-Plesa
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Amendment tabled 19-J. Jones
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Amendment tabled 18-Hinojosa
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Amendment tabled 17-Collier
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Record vote RV#257
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 2, Section 41 and Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 1493
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Record vote RV#256
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Amendment tabled 15-Wu
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Record vote RV#255
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Amendment tabled 14-Bucy
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Record vote RV#254
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Amendment tabled 13-Walle
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Amendment tabled 12-Howard
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Amendment tabled 11-Rodríguez Ramos
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Amendment tabled 10-Garcia Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Amendment tabled 9-Howard
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Amendment tabled 8-Martinez Fischer
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Amendment tabled 7-Simmons
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Amendment tabled 6-Simmons
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Amendment tabled 5-Plesa
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Amendment tabled 4-Turner
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Amendment tabled 3-Talarico
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Amendment tabled 2-Dutton
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Amended
|
1-Buckley
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Postponed
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1439
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Placed on Emergency Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2025
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2025
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2025
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2025
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 296
|
House
|
02/25/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 296
|
House
|
02/06/2025
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 221
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 201
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Statement(s) submitted
|
|
Journal Page: 198
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 190
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 190
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 187
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA37 Bettencourt
|
Journal Page: 187
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered FA37 Bettencourt
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
|
Journal Page: 187
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered FA36 Menéndez
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered FA35 J. Hinojosa
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered FA34 King
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered FA33 Middleton
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered FA32 Bettencourt
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered FA31 Blanco
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered FA30 Cook
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered FA29 Paxton
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered FA28 Perry
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered FA27 Menéndez
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered FA26 A. Hinojosa
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered FA25 Cook
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered FA24 Paxton
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered FA23 Menéndez
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered FA22 Menéndez
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered FA21 Menéndez
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered FA20 Menéndez
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered FA19 West
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered FA18 Menéndez
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered FA17 Middleton
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered FA16 Gutierrez
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered FA15 Menéndez
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered FA14 Parker
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered FA12 West
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered FA11 Menéndez
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered FA10 Menéndez
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered FA9 Alvarado
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered FA8 Creighton
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered FA7 Creighton
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered FA6 Creighton
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered FA5 Hancock
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered FA4 Creighton
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered FA3 Creighton
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2025
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2025
|
Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2025
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2025
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2025
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2025
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2025
|
Referred to Education K-16
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2025
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|