House | 05/02/2025 | Referred to s/c on County & Regional Government by Speaker | Journal Page: 2752 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2752 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2641 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1686 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1663 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1663 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1662 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1663 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1662 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1662 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1261 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1096 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 565 | |
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 565 | |
Senate | 03/07/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/07/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |