House | 04/24/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1834 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1834 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1739 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1406 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1395 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1395 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1395 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1395 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1395 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1395 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Amended | Journal Page: 1395 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | FA2 Huffman | Journal Page: 1394 |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Huffman | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Birdwell | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1394 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1393 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1403 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1366 | |
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 565 | |
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 565 | |
Senate | 03/07/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/07/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |