Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2051 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 04/14/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Birdwell, Hall S.B. No. 2051
 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2025; March 17, 2025, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 14, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 14, 2025,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2051 By:  Birdwell




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the impeachment or removal from office of certain
 public officers, including procedures governing the impeachment,
 trial on impeachment, and disqualification of state officers, and
 to the grounds for which certain public officers may be removed from
 office.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 665, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 665.008, 665.009, 665.010, and 665.011
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 665.008.  TESTIMONY IN IMPEACHMENT PROCEEDING. (a) All
 witness testimony in an impeachment proceeding, including
 testimony by the officer who is the subject of the proceeding, must
 be given:
 (1)  under oath; and
 (2)  in a session open to all members of the house or,
 if the proceeding is conducted by a committee, to all members of the
 committee.
 (b)  The presiding officer of a committee that conducts an
 investigation in an impeachment proceeding shall allow, but may not
 require, the officer who is the subject of the proceeding to testify
 before the committee in the officer's defense and have legal
 counsel present during the officer's testimony.  This subsection
 may not be construed to allow the officer who is the subject of an
 impeachment proceeding to cross-examine other witnesses in the
 impeachment proceeding.
 Sec. 665.009.  REVIEW OF COMMITTEE MATERIALS. (a)  This
 section applies to an impeachment proceeding in which an
 investigation or other portion of the proceeding is conducted by a
 committee.
 (b)  The committee must provide to each member of the house
 the committee's report and other materials related to the
 impeachment at least 72 hours before the house begins deliberating
 on the impeachment.
 (c)  To allow members of the house an opportunity to review
 the committee's report and other materials related to the
 impeachment, the house may not vote on the impeachment during the 72
 hours after the conclusion of the house's deliberations on the
 impeachment.
 Sec. 665.010.  INELIGIBILITY TO VOTE IN PROCEEDING INVOLVING
 FAMILY MEMBER. A member of the house is ineligible to vote in an
 impeachment proceeding, including in a portion of the proceeding
 conducted by a committee, if the member is related within the third
 degree by consanguinity or affinity as determined under Subchapter
 B, Chapter 573, to the officer who is the subject of the proceeding.
 Sec. 665.011.  REPORT OF COSTS OF IMPEACHMENT PROCEEDING.
 (a)  The house shall keep an accounting of all costs incurred by the
 house in connection with an impeachment proceeding, including
 investigative costs and costs incurred during the trial by the
 senate, if applicable.
 (b)  Not later than the 60th day after the conclusion of an
 impeachment proceeding by the house, the house shall deliver a
 report of the costs described by Subsection (a) incurred in
 connection with the proceedings to the comptroller, lieutenant
 governor, speaker of the house, Legislative Budget Board, chair of
 the senate committee on finance, and chair of the house committee on
 appropriations. If the senate conducts a trial on the impeachment,
 the house shall update the report to include the additional costs
 incurred by the house during the trial and deliver the updated
 report to those entities not later than the 60th day after the
 conclusion of the trial.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter B, Chapter 665, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 665.029, 665.030, 665.031, and 665.032
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 665.029.  PRESIDING OFFICER IN TRIAL OF GOVERNOR OR
 LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR. The presiding officer for the court of
 impeachment in a trial of the governor or lieutenant governor is:
 (1)  the chief justice of the Supreme Court of Texas;
 (2)  if the chief justice of the supreme court recuses
 himself or herself or is otherwise unavailable, the presiding judge
 of the Court of Criminal Appeals of Texas; or
 (3)  if both the chief justice of the supreme court and
 the presiding judge of the court of criminal appeals recuse
 themselves or are otherwise unavailable, a former appellate judge
 described by Section 75.003(a) assigned by the chief justice of the
 supreme court.
 Sec. 665.030.  TESTIMONY IN IMPEACHMENT TRIAL. All witness
 testimony in a trial on impeachment, including testimony by the
 officer who is the subject of the trial, must be given:
 (1)  under oath; and
 (2)  in a session open to all members of the senate.
 Sec. 665.031.  INELIGIBILITY TO VOTE IN TRIAL INVOLVING
 FAMILY MEMBER. A member of the senate is ineligible to vote on the
 removal of an individual from office following impeachment or the
 disqualification of an individual from holding any office of honor,
 trust, or profit under this state if the member of the senate is
 related to the individual within the third degree by consanguinity
 or affinity as determined under Subchapter B, Chapter 573.
 Sec. 665.032.  REPORT OF COSTS OF TRIAL. (a) The senate
 shall keep an accounting of all costs incurred by the senate in
 connection with the trial of an impeachment, including any costs
 incurred during the house impeachment proceeding.
 (b)  Not later than the 60th day after the conclusion of the
 trial of an impeachment, the senate shall deliver a report of all
 costs described by Subsection (a) to the comptroller, lieutenant
 governor, speaker of the house, Legislative Budget Board, chair of
 the senate committee on finance, and chair of the house committee on
 appropriations.
 SECTION 3.  Section 665.081, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 665.081.  [NO] REMOVAL ONLY FOR ACTS COMMITTED WHILE
 HOLDING [BEFORE ELECTION TO] OFFICE.  (a)  An officer in this state
 is subject to removal [may not be removed] from office only for an
 act the officer [may have] committed while holding an elected or
 appointed [before the officer's election to] office.
 (b)  The prohibition against the removal from office for an
 act the officer commits while not an officeholder [before the
 officer's election] is covered by:
 (1)  Section 21.024 [21.002], Local Government Code,
 for a mayor or alderman of a general law municipality; or
 (2)  Chapter 87, Local Government Code, for a county or
 precinct officer.
 SECTION 4.  Section 21.024, Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 21.024.  [NO] REMOVAL ONLY FOR ACTS COMMITTED WHILE
 HOLDING OFFICE [BEFORE ACTION].  An officer is subject to removal
 [may not be removed] under this subchapter only for an act the
 officer committed while holding an elected or appointed [before
 election to] office [if the act was a matter of public record or
 otherwise known to the voters].
 SECTION 5.  Section 87.001, Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 87.001.  [NO] REMOVAL ONLY FOR ACTS COMMITTED WHILE
 HOLDING OFFICE [PRIOR ACTION].  An officer is subject to removal
 [may not be removed] under this chapter only for an act the officer
 committed while holding an elected or appointed [before election
 to] office.
 SECTION 6.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 an impeachment proceeding, trial, or other removal proceeding
 commenced on or after the effective date of this Act. A proceeding
 or trial commenced before the effective date of this Act is governed
 by the law in effect when the proceeding was commenced, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2026, but only
 if the constitutional amendment proposed by the 89th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2025, clarifying and implementing certain
 provisions governing the impeachment, trial, removal from office,
 and disqualification of public officers is approved by the
 voters. If that amendment is not approved by the voters, this Act
 has no effect.
 * * * * *