LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB207
Witness List Draft: House Committee Report - May 13, 2025
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB207
Overview
Activity Timeline
Authors & Sponsors
Committee Assignments
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
View All
Official Action Record
Meeting Schedule
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB207
Witness List Draft: House Committee Report - May 13, 2025
Draft
Witness List Draft: Enrolled - May 20, 2025
Witness List Draft: Comm Sub - May 13, 2025
Witness List Draft: House Committee Report - May 13, 2025
Witness List Draft: Engrossed - April 1, 2025
Witness List Draft: Comm Sub - March 26, 2025
Witness List Draft: Senate Committee Report - March 26, 2025
Witness List Draft: Introduced - November 12, 2024
.pdf
.doc
.html
Witness List Draft: House Committee Report - May 13, 2025