House
|
05/01/2025
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2261
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Referred to s/c on Property Tax Appraisals by Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2025
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1499
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1499
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1499
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1499
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1499
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2025
|
Referred to Local Government
|
|
Journal Page: 676
|
Senate
|
03/24/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 676
|
Senate
|
03/07/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2025
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|