Senate | 05/05/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1553 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1505 | |
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Referred to Education K-16 | Journal Page: 682 | |
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 682 | |
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |