Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2141 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 04/14/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 2141
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2025; March 24, 2025, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 14, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 14, 2025,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2141 By:  Hinojosa of Hidalgo




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of specialty license plates to state and
 federal judges.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 504.403, Transportation Code, as amended
 by Chapter 1296 (H.B. 2357), Acts of the 82nd Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2011, and repealed by Chapter 1290 (H.B. 2017), Acts of the
 82nd Legislature, Regular Session, 2011, is reenacted and amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 504.403.  STATE AND FEDERAL JUDGES. (a) The department
 shall issue specialty license plates for a current or visiting
 state or federal judge. Except as provided by Subsection (b), the
 [The] license plates must include the words "State Judge" or "U.S.
 Judge," as appropriate.
 (b)  A person entitled to license plates under this section
 may elect to receive license plates that do not include the words
 "State Judge" or "U.S. Judge."
 (c) [(d)]  In this section, "state[:
 [(2)  "State] judge" means:
 (1) [(A)]  a justice of the supreme court;
 (2) [(B)]  a judge of the court of criminal appeals;
 (3) [(C)]  a judge of a court of appeals of this state;
 (4) [(D)]  a district court judge;
 (5) [(E)]  a presiding judge of an administrative
 judicial district; or
 (6) [(F)]  a statutory county court judge.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *