Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2141 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2025
Analysis March 10, 2025
Fiscal Note March 10, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Witness List April 14, 2025
Analysis April 14, 2025
Fiscal Note April 14, 2025
Bill April 14, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 14, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 13, 2025
Fiscal Note April 7, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 10, 2025
Analysis April 3, 2025