Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2148 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Hall, Creighton S.B. No. 2148
2- West
3-
4-
1+By: Hall S.B. No. 2148
2+ (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2025; March 24, 2025, read
3+ first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
4+ April 7, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 11,
5+ Nays 0; April 7, 2025, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
57
68
79 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
810 AN ACT
911 relating to the reliability of the electricity supply chain.
1012 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1113 SECTION 1. Section 38.077, Utilities Code, is amended to
1214 read as follows:
1315 Sec. 38.077. RELIABILITY [LOAD SHEDDING] EXERCISES. (a)
1416 In this section, "critical facility" means a transmission
1517 substation and any associated control centers that, if rendered
1618 inoperable or damaged because of a physical attack, could cause
1719 widespread instability, uncontrolled separation, or cascading
1820 outages within an interconnection.
1921 (b) The commission and the independent organization
2022 certified for the ERCOT power region under Section 39.151 shall
2123 conduct simulated or tabletop load shedding exercises with
2224 providers of electric generation service and transmission and
2325 distribution service in the ERCOT power region.
2426 [(b)] The commission shall ensure that each year at least
2527 one simulated or tabletop load shedding exercise is conducted
2628 during a summer month and one simulated or tabletop load shedding
2729 exercise is conducted during a winter month.
2830 (c) The commission and the independent organization
2931 certified for the ERCOT power region under Section 39.151 shall
3032 conduct simulated or tabletop exercises with providers of electric
3133 generation service and transmission and distribution service in the
3234 ERCOT power region to mitigate and prepare for a threat of an attack
3335 or an actual physical attack on a critical facility. The exercises
3436 required by this subsection are in addition to the exercises
3537 required by Subsection (b) and any requirements of the North
3638 American Electric Reliability Corporation Critical Infrastructure
3739 Protection plan standards. The commission and the independent
3840 organization shall conduct the exercises under this subsection at
3941 least once every two years.
4042 (d) A simulated or tabletop exercise conducted under
4143 Subsection (c) must identify the roles and responsibilities of the
4244 following in the event of a threat of an attack or an actual
4345 physical attack on a critical facility:
4446 (1) transmission and distribution service providers;
4547 (2) providers of electric generation service;
4648 (3) law enforcement;
4749 (4) the independent organization certified for the
4850 ERCOT power region under Section 39.151; and
4951 (5) the commission.
5052 (e) A transmission and distribution service provider is not
5153 required to disclose the specific location of the provider's
5254 critical substations to the commission or the independent
5355 organization certified for the ERCOT power region under Section
5456 39.151 for the purposes of a simulated or tabletop exercise
5557 conducted under Subsection (c).
5658 (f) Each provider of electric generation service and of
5759 transmission and distribution service that participates in a
5860 simulated or tabletop exercise conducted under Subsection (c) shall
5961 provide to the independent organization certified for the ERCOT
6062 power region under Section 39.151 a written attestation that the
6163 provider has coordinated with law enforcement when identifying
6264 roles and responsibilities under Subsection (d).
6365 SECTION 2. Not later than December 31, 2026, the Public
6466 Utility Commission of Texas and the independent organization
6567 certified under Section 39.151, Utilities Code, for the ERCOT power
6668 region shall conduct a simulated or tabletop exercise with each
6769 provider of electric generation service and of transmission and
6870 distribution service as required by Section 38.077(c), Utilities
6971 Code, as added by this Act.
7072 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
7173 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
7274 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
7375 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
7476 Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
77+ * * * * *