Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB227 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: West, Blanco S.B. No. 227
1+By: West S.B. No. 227
2+ (In the Senate - Filed November 12, 2024; February 3, 2025,
3+ read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human
4+ Services; April 14, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable
5+ Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0;
6+ April 14, 2025, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 227 By: Perry
29
310
411
512
613 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
714 AN ACT
815 relating to the application review process for certain delayed
916 birth certificates.
1017 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
11- SECTION 1. This Act shall be known as the Charles Edward
12- Barton Act.
13- SECTION 2. Section 192.025, Health and Safety Code, is
18+ SECTION 1. Section 192.025, Health and Safety Code, is
1419 amended by adding Subsections (f) and (g) to read as follows:
1520 (f) The state registrar may not reject an application under
1621 this subchapter based solely on the inclusion of supporting
1722 evidence that contains inconsistent or contradictory information
1823 if, based on the contents of the application as a whole, the state
1924 registrar determines by a preponderance of the evidence the
2025 applicant's identity and place of birth. In making a determination
2126 under this subsection, the state registrar shall consider and give
2227 weight to:
2328 (1) any supporting evidence that raises a legitimate
2429 question as to the applicant's actual place of birth;
2530 (2) the inclusion of a valid driver's license or
2631 personal identification certificate; and
2732 (3) the inclusion of a verified affidavit by a person
2833 with personal knowledge of the applicant's identity.
2934 (g) Notwithstanding any other law, if a delayed birth
3035 certificate of a person who was born before January 1, 1971, is
3136 otherwise acceptable for registration and the identity of one
3237 parent of the person is established by information not
3338 contradictory to information available to the state registrar, the
3439 state registrar shall register the certificate with only the
3540 established parent's name entered on the certificate.
36- SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
41+ SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
42+ * * * * *