House | 04/22/2025 | Referred to s/c on County & Regional Government by Speaker | Journal Page: 1652 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1652 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1359 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1097 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1090 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1090 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1090 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1090 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 937 | |
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 709 | |
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 709 | |
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |