House | 05/05/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 2033 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2033 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1835 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Passed | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1412 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1412 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Rules suspended-Intent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1406 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Referred to Local Government | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1349 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 1349 | |
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |