Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2321 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 12, 2025
Analysis March 12, 2025
Bill March 11, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 17, 2025
Bill April 16, 2025
Fiscal Note April 16, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 7, 2025
Witness List April 7, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 5, 2025
Fiscal Note March 28, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 7, 2025

Analysis

Analysis March 28, 2025