House | 05/01/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2641 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1679 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1679 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1679 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1648 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Amendment fails of adoption | Journal Page: 1648 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | FA2 Alvarado | Journal Page: 1648 |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1648 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Amended | Journal Page: 1648 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1648 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1406 | |
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 984 | |
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 713 | |
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 713 | |
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |