House | 04/24/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1834 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1834 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1730 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1406 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1379 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1379 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1379 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1379 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1379 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1379 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Amended | Journal Page: 1379 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Campbell | Journal Page: 1378 |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Campbell | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1378 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1378 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1404 | |
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1034 | |
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 716 | |
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 716 | |
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |