House | 05/07/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | Journal Page: 2462 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2462 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2260 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1569 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1569 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1569 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1260 | |
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 717 | |
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 717 | |
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |