House | 05/10/2025 | Referred to Delivery of Government Efficiency | ||
House | 05/08/2025 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/08/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 05/08/2025 | Passed | ||
Senate | 05/08/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1879 | |
Senate | 05/08/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1879 | |
Senate | 05/08/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1879 | |
Senate | 05/08/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1879 | |
Senate | 05/08/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1879 | |
Senate | 05/08/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1879 | |
Senate | 05/08/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 05/07/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/07/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1861 | |
Senate | 05/06/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1798 | |
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1761 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1366 | |
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 984 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 763 | |
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 717 | |
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 717 | |
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |