House | 05/07/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Referred to Homeland Security, Public Safety & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 2752 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2752 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2645 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1709 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1703 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1703 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1703 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1703 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1703 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1703 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 718 | |
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 718 | |
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |