House | 04/30/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Referred to Corrections | Journal Page: 1834 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1834 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1739 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1406 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Statement(s) submitted | Journal Page: 1391 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1391 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1391 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1391 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1391 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1391 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1390 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Amended | Journal Page: 1390 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Huffman | Journal Page: 1390 |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1390 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Huffman | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1390 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1404 | |
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1096 | |
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 720 | |
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 720 | |
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |