House | 05/02/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Recommendations filed with the Senate | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 1582 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1582 | |
House | 04/10/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1348 | |
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1018 | |
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1018 | |
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 848 | |
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/28/2025 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 780 | |
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 780 | |
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |