Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2501 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 05/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 2501
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2025; April 3, 2025, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence; May 1, 2025,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 1, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2501 By:  Hughes




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to selection of an attorney by an indigent parent as
 attorney ad litem for the parent in certain suits affecting the
 parent-child relationship.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 107.013(a) and (a-1), Family Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Subject to Section 107.01301, in [In] a suit filed by a
 governmental entity under Subtitle E in which termination of the
 parent-child relationship or the appointment of a conservator for a
 child is requested, the court shall appoint an attorney ad litem to
 represent the interests of:
 (1)  an indigent parent of the child who responds in
 opposition to the termination or appointment;
 (2)  a parent served by citation by publication;
 (3)  an alleged father who failed to register with the
 registry under Chapter 160 and whose identity or location is
 unknown; and
 (4)  an alleged father who registered with the
 paternity registry under Chapter 160, but the petitioner's attempt
 to personally serve citation at the address provided to the
 registry and at any other address for the alleged father known by
 the petitioner has been unsuccessful.
 (a-1)  In a suit described by Subsection (a), if a parent is
 not represented by an attorney at the parent's first appearance in
 court, the court shall inform the parent of:
 (1)  the right to be represented by an attorney; and
 (2)  if the parent is indigent and appears in
 opposition to the suit, the right to an attorney ad litem appointed
 by the court or an attorney selected by the parent and compensated
 by the county under Section 107.01301.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter B, Chapter 107, Family Code, is
 amended by adding Section 107.01301 to read as follows:
 Sec. 107.01301.  SELECTION OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM BY INDIGENT
 PARENT. (a) A parent who the court has determined is indigent for
 the purposes of Section 107.013 may select an attorney to represent
 the parent in a suit described by Section 107.013(a).
 (b)  An attorney selected by a parent under Subsection (a)
 must:
 (1)  be licensed to practice law in this state;
 (2)  be in good standing with the State Bar of Texas;
 and
 (3)  meet the applicable continuing education
 requirements of Section 107.0131.
 (c)  The selection of an attorney by a parent under
 Subsection (a) is independent of any appointment system implemented
 by the court, including the rotation system described by Section
 37.004, Government Code. The court may not take any action that
 influences, directs, or interferes with the selection of an
 attorney by a parent under Subsection (a).
 (d)  An attorney selected by a parent under Subsection (a)
 shall serve as the parent's counsel of record upon filing with the
 court a notice of appearance and, if the parent is represented by
 other counsel, a motion to substitute counsel with the court. The
 filing of the notice and, if applicable, the motion is a ministerial
 act and does not require the approval of the court. The court's
 review of a notice and motion filed under this subsection shall be
 limited to confirming the attorney meets the requirements of
 Subsection (b). Upon confirming an attorney selected by a parent
 under Subsection (a) meets the requirements of Subsection (b), the
 court shall:
 (1)  grant attorney's motion to substitute counsel, if
 applicable; and
 (2)  terminate the appointment of any previously
 appointed attorney ad litem for the parent.
 (e)  A court may not:
 (1)  deny or delay approval of a motion under
 Subsection (d) except to confirm that the attorney meets the
 requirements of Subsection (b); or
 (2)  impose any additional requirements on the attorney
 other than those described by Subsection (b).
 (f)  An attorney serving as attorney ad litem for a parent
 under this section:
 (1)  has the powers and duties described by Section
 107.0131 or 107.0132, as applicable; and
 (2)  is subject to disciplinary action as provided by
 Section 107.0133.
 (g)  Payment for services rendered by an attorney serving as
 attorney ad litem for a parent under this section shall be:
 (1)  equal to the payments made to an attorney
 appointed under Section 107.013 to serve as attorney ad litem for an
 indigent parent;
 (2)  made in accordance with existing payment
 procedures applicable to an attorney appointed under Section
 107.013 to serve as attorney ad litem for an indigent parent; and
 (3)  paid from the general funds of the county.
 (h)  A court may not adopt or enforce local rules that
 conflict with this section, impose additional requirements on the
 selection of an attorney under this section, or otherwise interfere
 with the right of a parent to select an attorney under Subsection
 (a). Interference with the selection of an attorney by a parent
 under Subsection (a) for financial gain or favoritism is a
 violation of judicial ethics and may subject a judge to discipline
 under the Code of Judicial Conduct or prosecution under the penal
 laws of this state, including Section 36.02 or 36.08, Penal Code, as
 applicable.
 (i)  This section does not limit the authority of a court to
 remove an attorney for good cause under applicable law.
 (j)  The Office of Court Administration of the Texas Judicial
 System may adopt rules necessary to implement this section.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a suit affecting the parent-child relationship that is filed on
 or after the effective date of this Act. A suit affecting the
 parent-child relationship filed before the effective date of this
 Act is governed by the law in effect on the date the suit was filed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act but not later than January 1, 2026, the Office of Court
 Administration of the Texas Judicial System shall adopt rules
 necessary to implement Section 107.01301, Family Code, as added by
 this Act.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *