Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2521 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/30/2025

                            By: Bettencourt S.B. No. 2521
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2025; April 3, 2025, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Local Government;
 April 30, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6,
 Nays 0; April 30, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to notification of the chief appraiser of an appraisal
 district of the death of a resident of the county in which the
 district is located and the determination by the chief appraiser of
 the effect of the decedent's death on the continued eligibility of
 any property in the county previously owned by the decedent for any
 exemption allowed for the property.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 193.003, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  The local registrar shall:
 (1)  prepare an abstract of each death certificate
 filed with the local registrar during a month for a decedent 18
 years of age or older at the time of death; and
 (2)  not later than the last day of the following month,
 file each abstract described by Subdivision (1) with the chief
 appraiser of the appraisal district for the decedent's county of
 residence.
 SECTION 2.  Section 11.43, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (h-2) to read as follows:
 (h-2)  The chief appraiser shall review each death
 certificate abstract received from the local registrar under
 Section 193.003(c), Health and Safety Code, and investigate to
 determine whether the decedent was allowed an exemption on property
 that no longer qualifies for the exemption due to the decedent's
 death and whether an individual qualifies for an exemption on the
 property as the surviving spouse or a surviving child of the
 decedent.  Subject to Subsection (q), if the chief appraiser
 determines that the property should not be exempt, the chief
 appraiser shall cancel the exemption and enter notice of the
 cancellation in the appraisal record pertaining to the property not
 later than the fifth day after the date the exemption is canceled.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *