House | 05/02/2025 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 2753 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2753 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2647 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Passed | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1694 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1694 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | FA2 Middleton | Journal Page: 1694 |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Amended | Journal Page: 1694 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1694 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1694 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 910 | |
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 910 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |