Senate | 05/01/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1608 | |
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 913 | |
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 913 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |