Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2569 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 04/16/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Flores S.B. No. 2569
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2025; April 3, 2025, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 10, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6,
 Nays 0; April 10, 2025, sent to printer.)




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the reporting requirement for certain law enforcement
 agencies regarding the agencies' use or operation of an unmanned
 aircraft.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 423.008(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  Not earlier than January 1 and not later than January 15
 of each odd-numbered year, each state law enforcement agency and
 each county or municipal law enforcement agency located in a county
 or municipality, as applicable, with a population greater than
 150,000, that used or operated an unmanned aircraft during the
 preceding 24 months shall [issue a written report to the governor,
 the lieutenant governor, and each member of the legislature and
 shall:
 [(1)  retain the report for public viewing; and
 [(2)]  post a [the] report regarding the agency's use or
 operation of unmanned aircraft on the [law enforcement] agency's
 publicly accessible Internet website or, if the agency does not
 have a publicly accessible Internet website, otherwise make the
 report available to the public [one exists].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *