House | 04/30/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Referred to Intergovernmental Affairs | Journal Page: 2036 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2036 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1860 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1505 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1500 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1500 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1500 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1500 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1500 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1500 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1500 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 915 | |
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 915 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |