Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2581 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/16/2025

                    By: Hancock S.B. No. 2581
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2025; April 3, 2025, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 16, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; April 16, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the repeal of a provision governing the operation of
 jail commissaries in certain counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 351.04155, Local Government Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *