Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2586 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/05/2025

                            By: Flores S.B. No. 2586
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2025; April 3, 2025, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 May 5, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 5, 2025,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2586 By:  King




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to information that a property owners' association must
 file with the Texas Real Estate Commission.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 209, Property Code, is amended by adding
 Section 209.00405 to read as follows:
 Sec. 209.00405.  INFORMATION TO BE FILED WITH TEXAS REAL
 ESTATE COMMISSION. (a) In this section, "commission" means the
 Texas Real Estate Commission.
 (b)  Not later than the seventh day after the date a property
 owners' association files a management certificate for recording
 under Section 209.004(a) or files an amended management certificate
 for recording under Section 209.004(b), the property owners'
 association shall electronically file the following information
 with the commission:
 (1)  the property owners' association's dedicatory
 instruments; and
 (2)  the enforcement policy required under Section
 209.0061, as applicable.
 (c)  The commission shall only collect the information
 required under Subsection (b) for the purpose of making the data
 accessible to the general public through an Internet website.
 (d)  Except as provided under Subsection (e), a property
 owners' association and its officers, directors, employees, and
 agents are not subject to liability to any person for a delay in
 electronically filing or failure to electronically file the
 information required under Subsection (b) with the commission,
 unless the delay or failure is wilful or caused by gross negligence.
 (e)  If a property owners' association fails to file the
 information required under Subsection (b), an owner is not liable
 to the property owners' association for any assessments, fines, or
 fees levied against the owner by the association during the period
 the information is not electronically filed with the commission as
 required under Subsection (b).
 SECTION 2.  (a) Not later than December 1, 2025, the Texas
 Real Estate Commission shall establish and make available the
 system necessary for the electronic filing of the information
 required under Section 209.00405(b), Property Code, as added by
 this Act.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Section 209.00405(b), Property Code, as
 added by this Act, a property owners' association that has on or
 before December 1, 2025, recorded a management certificate or
 amended management certificate with a county clerk under Section
 209.004, Property Code, shall electronically file the information
 required by Section 209.00405(b), Property Code, with the Texas
 Real Estate Commission not later than June 1, 2026.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *