House | 05/02/2025 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 2753 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2753 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2645 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1709 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1704 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1704 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1704 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1704 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 915 | |
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 915 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |