Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2595 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 04/23/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Middleton S.B. No. 2595
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2025; April 3, 2025, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 7, 2025, re-referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 22, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 0; April 22, 2025,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2595 By:  Hughes




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of the criminal offense of harassing,
 intimidating, or threatening another person while concealing
 identity with a mask or other headgear.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 42, Penal Code, is amended by adding
 Section 42.16 to read as follows:
 Sec. 42.16.  HARASSING, INTIMIDATING, OR THREATENING PERSON
 WHILE CONCEALING IDENTITY WITH MASK OR OTHER HEADGEAR.  (a) In this
 section:
 (1)  "Harass" means to engage in a pattern of conduct
 directed at a particular person or group of persons that is intended
 to cause the person or group to:
 (A)  fear for the person's or group's safety; or
 (B)  experience substantial emotional distress.
 (2)  "Intimidate" means to engage in conduct that is
 intended to cause another person or group of persons, out of fear
 for the person's or group's safety, to take, or refrain from taking,
 certain actions.
 (3)  "Mask or other headgear" means any article or
 device worn on a person's head that tends to conceal the identity
 of, or substantially increase the difficulty in identifying, the
 person wearing the article or device.
 (4)  "Threaten" means to communicate a clear intention
 to cause imminent bodily injury or death to a person.
 (b)  A person commits an offense if the person, while wearing
 a mask or other headgear for the purpose of concealing the identity
 of the person or substantially increasing the difficulty in
 identifying the person, intentionally harasses, intimidates, or
 threatens another person or group of persons in a public place.
 (c)  An offense under this section is a Class B misdemeanor.
 (d)  It is an affirmative defense to prosecution under this
 section that the mask or other headgear is worn primarily:
 (1)  to celebrate a holiday or participate in a
 celebration at which a mask or other headgear is commonly worn,
 including Halloween or a masquerade ball;
 (2)  to ensure physical safety while engaged in an
 occupation, trade, or profession;
 (3)  to ensure protection from the weather or while
 participating in a winter sport;
 (4)  for purposes of a theatrical production or other
 artistic endeavor;
 (5)  for purposes of ensuring safety during an
 emergency, including while participating in an emergency drill;
 (6)  to protect a person's health or ensure that the
 person does not spread illness; or
 (7)  for any religious purpose.
 (e)  If conduct constituting an offense under this section
 also constitutes an offense under another section of this code, the
 actor may be prosecuted under either section or both sections.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *