Senate | 04/02/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 881 | |
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 848 | |
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 398 | |
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 365 | |
Senate | 02/05/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 200 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 97 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 97 | |
Senate | 11/12/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/12/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |