Senate | 05/07/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 05/06/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/06/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1552 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 917 | |
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 917 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |