Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2615 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/28/2025

                            By: Creighton S.B. No. 2615
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2025; April 3, 2025, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education K-16;
 April 28, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 2; April 28, 2025,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2615 By:  Middleton




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to restricting remote work by employees of public
 institutions of higher education.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 51, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 51.992 to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.992.  RESTRICTIONS ON REMOTE WORK BY HIGHER
 EDUCATION EMPLOYEES. (a) In this section, "institution of higher
 education" has the meaning assigned by Section 61.003.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Section 658.010, Government Code, an
 institution of higher education may not allow an employee to work
 remotely except as provided by this section.
 (c)  An institution of higher education may allow an employee
 to work remotely on a temporary or permanent basis if the employee:
 (1)  has a temporary illness;
 (2)  has a temporary or permanent medical condition or
 disability requiring the institution to make a reasonable
 accommodation under state or federal law for the employee to work
 remotely; or
 (3)  is employed in a non-teaching position and:
 (A)  has demonstrated the ability to work well
 with minimal supervision;
 (B)  has a deep understanding of the employee's
 duties and responsibilities;
 (C)  has demonstrated the ability to manage the
 employee's time;
 (D)  has a record of thoroughly and efficiently
 accomplishing the employee's duties; and
 (E)  is employed in a position that does not
 require the employee's day-to-day physical presence at the
 institution or in-person interaction with students,
 administration, or other employees.
 (d)  The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board may adopt
 rules as necessary to implement this section.
 SECTION 2.  Section 51.992, Education Code, as added by this
 Act, applies beginning with the 2025-2026 academic year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *