E
|
04/29/2025
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1609
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2262
|
Senate
|
04/28/2025
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1549
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1505
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1487
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1747
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#463
|
Journal Page: 1747
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1747
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Record vote RV#463
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1738
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1725
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#457
|
Journal Page: 1724
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1724
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1724
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 1757
|
Journal Page: 1725
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 1086
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1086
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 526
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 482
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 467
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 467
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 467
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 467
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 467
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 466
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 466
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Perry
|
Journal Page: 466
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 466
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 466
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Rules suspended-Constitutional 60-Day
|
|
Journal Page: 466
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 479
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2025
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 97
|
Senate
|
02/03/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 97
|
Senate
|
11/12/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/12/2024
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|