By: Campbell, Paxton S.B. No. 2626 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2025; April 3, 2025, read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs; April 14, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 14, 2025, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to ectopic pregnancies and continuing education for certain physicians and nurses regarding treatment of certain pregnancy-related conditions. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 245.002(4-a), Health and Safety Code, is amended to read as follows: (4-a) "Ectopic pregnancy" means the implantation of a fertilized egg or embryo: (A) outside of the uterus; (B) in an intrauterine location at which the fertilized egg or embryo becomes nonviable; or (C) in a scarred portion of the uterus. SECTION 2. Subchapter B, Chapter 156, Occupations Code, is amended by adding Section 156.061 to read as follows: Sec. 156.061. CONTINUING MEDICAL EDUCATION REGARDING TREATMENT OF CERTAIN PREGNANCY-RELATED CONDITIONS. (a) In this section: (1) "Abortion" and "ectopic pregnancy" have the meanings assigned by Section 245.002, Health and Safety Code. (2) "Medical emergency" has the meaning assigned by Section 171.002, Health and Safety Code. (b) A physician licensed under this subtitle who submits an application for renewal of a registration permit and whose practice includes treating pregnant women shall complete, in accordance with this section, at least one hour of continuing medical education approved by the board on the treatment of: (1) pregnancy-related medical emergencies; (2) ectopic pregnancy; and (3) situations involving a dead, unborn child whose death was caused by a spontaneous abortion. (c) The continuing medical education required under Subsection (b) must include instruction on: (1) standards of care for managing a condition or situation described by Subsection (b); (2) identification of and timely response to a medical emergency caused or aggravated by a woman's pregnancy and that requires intervention; (3) how abortion is defined under Section 245.002, Health and Safety Code, including the medical situations and interventions excluded from abortion regulations protecting unborn life; (4) how medical emergency is defined under Section 171.002, Health and Safety Code, and what interventions are permitted in a medical emergency involving a pregnant woman; and (5) communication strategies for effectively discussing a condition or situation described by Subsection (b) with patients and their families. (d) A physician must complete one hour of continuing medical education required by Subsection (b) in each of the first two renewal periods following the issuance of the physician's initial registration permit under this chapter, with one hour to be completed not later than the first anniversary of the date of issuance. (e) After the period described by Subsection (d), a physician must complete not less than one hour of continuing medical education as described by Subsection (b) every eight years. (f) The hours required by this section may be counted toward the hours of continuing medical education required by Section 156.051(a)(2). (g) The board shall adopt rules to implement this section, including rules to establish the content of and approval requirements for continuing medical education required under this section. SECTION 3. Subchapter G, Chapter 301, Occupations Code, is amended by adding Section 301.309 to read as follows: Sec. 301.309. CONTINUING EDUCATION REGARDING TREATMENT OF CERTAIN PREGNANCY-RELATED CONDITIONS. (a) In this section: (1) "Abortion" and "ectopic pregnancy" have the meanings assigned by Section 245.002, Health and Safety Code. (2) "Medical emergency" has the meaning assigned by Section 171.002, Health and Safety Code. (b) As part of a continuing competency program under Section 301.303, a license holder whose practice includes treating pregnant women and who is required under board rules to comply with this section shall complete at least one hour of continuing education during each two-year licensing period relating to the treatment of: (1) pregnancy-related medical emergencies; (2) ectopic pregnancy; and (3) situations involving a dead, unborn child whose death was caused by a spontaneous abortion. (c) The continuing education under Subsection (b) must include instruction on: (1) standards of care for managing a condition or situation described by Subsection (b); (2) identification of and timely response to a medical emergency caused or aggravated by a woman's pregnancy and that requires intervention; (3) how abortion is defined under Section 245.002, Health and Safety Code, including the medical situations and interventions excluded from abortion regulations protecting unborn life; (4) how medical emergency is defined under Section 171.002, Health and Safety Code, and what interventions are permitted in a medical emergency involving a pregnant woman; and (5) communication strategies for effectively discussing a condition or situation described by Subsection (b) with patients and their families. (d) The continuing education required under Subsection (b) must be part of a program approved under Section 301.303(c). (e) The board shall adopt rules to identify the license holders who are required to complete continuing education under Subsection (b) and to establish the content of that continuing education. The board may adopt other rules to implement this section, including rules under Section 301.303(c) for the approval of education programs and providers. SECTION 4. (a) Not later than December 1, 2025, the Texas Medical Board shall adopt rules necessary to implement Section 156.061, Occupations Code, as added by this Act. (b) Not later than December 1, 2025, the Texas Board of Nursing shall adopt rules necessary to implement Section 301.309, Occupations Code, as added by this Act. SECTION 5. (a) Section 156.061, Occupations Code, as added by this Act, applies only to an application for renewal of a registration permit submitted on or after January 1, 2026. An application submitted before January 1, 2026, is governed by the law in effect immediately before the effective date of this Act, and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. (b) Section 301.309, Occupations Code, as added by this Act, applies only to an application for the renewal of a license to practice nursing submitted on or after January 1, 2026. An application submitted before January 1, 2026, is governed by the law in effect immediately before the effective date of this Act, and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2025. * * * * *