Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2626 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Campbell, et al. S.B. No. 2626
1+By: Campbell, Paxton S.B. No. 2626
2+ (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2025; April 3, 2025, read
3+ first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
4+ April 14, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9,
5+ Nays 0; April 14, 2025, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
49
510
611 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
712 AN ACT
813 relating to ectopic pregnancies and continuing education for
914 certain physicians and nurses regarding treatment of certain
1015 pregnancy-related conditions.
1116 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1217 SECTION 1. Section 245.002(4-a), Health and Safety Code, is
1318 amended to read as follows:
1419 (4-a) "Ectopic pregnancy" means the implantation of a
1520 fertilized egg or embryo:
1621 (A) outside of the uterus;
1722 (B) in an intrauterine location at which the
1823 fertilized egg or embryo becomes nonviable; or
1924 (C) in a scarred portion of the uterus.
2025 SECTION 2. Subchapter B, Chapter 156, Occupations Code, is
2126 amended by adding Section 156.061 to read as follows:
2227 Sec. 156.061. CONTINUING MEDICAL EDUCATION REGARDING
2328 TREATMENT OF CERTAIN PREGNANCY-RELATED CONDITIONS. (a) In this
2429 section:
2530 (1) "Abortion" and "ectopic pregnancy" have the
2631 meanings assigned by Section 245.002, Health and Safety Code.
2732 (2) "Medical emergency" has the meaning assigned by
2833 Section 171.002, Health and Safety Code.
2934 (b) A physician licensed under this subtitle who submits an
3035 application for renewal of a registration permit and whose practice
3136 includes treating pregnant women shall complete, in accordance with
3237 this section, at least one hour of continuing medical education
3338 approved by the board on the treatment of:
3439 (1) pregnancy-related medical emergencies;
3540 (2) ectopic pregnancy; and
3641 (3) situations involving a dead, unborn child whose
3742 death was caused by a spontaneous abortion.
3843 (c) The continuing medical education required under
3944 Subsection (b) must include instruction on:
4045 (1) standards of care for managing a condition or
4146 situation described by Subsection (b);
4247 (2) identification of and timely response to a medical
4348 emergency caused or aggravated by a woman's pregnancy and that
4449 requires intervention;
4550 (3) how abortion is defined under Section 245.002,
4651 Health and Safety Code, including the medical situations and
4752 interventions excluded from abortion regulations protecting unborn
4853 life;
4954 (4) how medical emergency is defined under Section
5055 171.002, Health and Safety Code, and what interventions are
5156 permitted in a medical emergency involving a pregnant woman; and
5257 (5) communication strategies for effectively
5358 discussing a condition or situation described by Subsection (b)
5459 with patients and their families.
5560 (d) A physician must complete one hour of continuing medical
5661 education required by Subsection (b) in each of the first two
5762 renewal periods following the issuance of the physician's initial
5863 registration permit under this chapter, with one hour to be
5964 completed not later than the first anniversary of the date of
6065 issuance.
6166 (e) After the period described by Subsection (d), a
6267 physician must complete not less than one hour of continuing
6368 medical education as described by Subsection (b) every eight years.
6469 (f) The hours required by this section may be counted toward
6570 the hours of continuing medical education required by Section
6671 156.051(a)(2).
6772 (g) The board shall adopt rules to implement this section,
6873 including rules to establish the content of and approval
6974 requirements for continuing medical education required under this
7075 section.
7176 SECTION 3. Subchapter G, Chapter 301, Occupations Code, is
7277 amended by adding Section 301.309 to read as follows:
7378 Sec. 301.309. CONTINUING EDUCATION REGARDING TREATMENT OF
7479 CERTAIN PREGNANCY-RELATED CONDITIONS. (a) In this section:
7580 (1) "Abortion" and "ectopic pregnancy" have the
7681 meanings assigned by Section 245.002, Health and Safety Code.
7782 (2) "Medical emergency" has the meaning assigned by
7883 Section 171.002, Health and Safety Code.
7984 (b) As part of a continuing competency program under Section
8085 301.303, a license holder whose practice includes treating pregnant
8186 women and who is required under board rules to comply with this
8287 section shall complete at least one hour of continuing education
8388 during each two-year licensing period relating to the treatment of:
8489 (1) pregnancy-related medical emergencies;
8590 (2) ectopic pregnancy; and
8691 (3) situations involving a dead, unborn child whose
8792 death was caused by a spontaneous abortion.
8893 (c) The continuing education under Subsection (b) must
8994 include instruction on:
9095 (1) standards of care for managing a condition or
9196 situation described by Subsection (b);
9297 (2) identification of and timely response to a medical
9398 emergency caused or aggravated by a woman's pregnancy and that
9499 requires intervention;
95100 (3) how abortion is defined under Section 245.002,
96101 Health and Safety Code, including the medical situations and
97102 interventions excluded from abortion regulations protecting unborn
98103 life;
99104 (4) how medical emergency is defined under Section
100105 171.002, Health and Safety Code, and what interventions are
101106 permitted in a medical emergency involving a pregnant woman; and
102107 (5) communication strategies for effectively
103108 discussing a condition or situation described by Subsection (b)
104109 with patients and their families.
105110 (d) The continuing education required under Subsection (b)
106111 must be part of a program approved under Section 301.303(c).
107112 (e) The board shall adopt rules to identify the license
108113 holders who are required to complete continuing education under
109114 Subsection (b) and to establish the content of that continuing
110115 education. The board may adopt other rules to implement this
111116 section, including rules under Section 301.303(c) for the approval
112117 of education programs and providers.
113118 SECTION 4. (a) Not later than December 1, 2025, the Texas
114119 Medical Board shall adopt rules necessary to implement Section
115120 156.061, Occupations Code, as added by this Act.
116121 (b) Not later than December 1, 2025, the Texas Board of
117122 Nursing shall adopt rules necessary to implement Section 301.309,
118123 Occupations Code, as added by this Act.
119124 SECTION 5. (a) Section 156.061, Occupations Code, as added
120125 by this Act, applies only to an application for renewal of a
121126 registration permit submitted on or after January 1, 2026. An
122127 application submitted before January 1, 2026, is governed by the
123128 law in effect immediately before the effective date of this Act, and
124129 the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
125130 (b) Section 301.309, Occupations Code, as added by this Act,
126131 applies only to an application for the renewal of a license to
127132 practice nursing submitted on or after January 1, 2026. An
128133 application submitted before January 1, 2026, is governed by the
129134 law in effect immediately before the effective date of this Act, and
130135 the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
131136 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
137+ * * * * *