Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2629 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 13, 2025
Analysis March 13, 2025
Fiscal Note March 13, 2025

House Committee Report

Analysis May 1, 2025
Bill May 1, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Witness List April 16, 2025
Bill April 16, 2025

Enrolled

Bill May 6, 2025

Analysis

Analysis May 1, 2025
Analysis April 8, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill May 1, 2025
Bill April 16, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 9, 2025