Senate | 05/05/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |