Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB264 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Perry S.B. No. 264
2-
3-
2+ (In the Senate - Filed November 12, 2024; February 3, 2025,
3+ read first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
4+ March 26, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 11,
5+ Nays 0; March 26, 2025, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
47
58
69 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
710 AN ACT
811 relating to discontinuing group self-insurance coverage and
912 dissolving the Texas self-insurance group guaranty fund and trust
1013 fund under the Texas Workers' Compensation Act.
1114 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1215 SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 407A, Labor Code, is
1316 amended by adding Section 407A.0521 to read as follows:
1417 Sec. 407A.0521. NEW CERTIFICATES OF APPROVAL PROHIBITED.
1518 (a) Notwithstanding Section 407A.052, the commissioner may not
1619 issue a certificate of approval to a proposed group on or after
1720 September 1, 2025.
1821 (b) The commissioner may amend a certificate of approval
1922 issued to a group before September 1, 2025.
2023 SECTION 2. Subchapter J, Chapter 407A, Labor Code, is
2124 amended by adding Section 407A.4561 to read as follows:
2225 Sec. 407A.4561. REVISED PLAN OF OPERATION: WIND DOWN. (a)
2326 In this section, "qualified group" means a group that:
2427 (1) holds a current certificate of approval under this
2528 chapter; and
2629 (2) has not been determined by the commissioner to be
2730 insolvent under Section 407A.355.
2831 (b) The board shall submit to the commissioner for approval
2932 a revised plan of operation to wind down and dissolve the guaranty
3033 fund and trust fund. The plan must include:
3134 (1) steps for:
3235 (A) distributing any remaining money in the
3336 guaranty fund and trust fund to qualified groups; and
3437 (B) notifying interested parties; and
3538 (2) an estimated timeline for the wind down.
3639 (c) The commissioner shall approve the board's revised plan
3740 of operation if the commissioner determines that the plan
3841 sufficiently describes the actions the board will take to wind down
3942 and dissolve the guaranty fund and trust fund.
4043 (d) The board shall:
4144 (1) implement the revised plan of operation approved
4245 under Subsection (b); and
4346 (2) provide written notice to the commissioner of the
4447 completion of the wind down not later than the 30th day after the
4548 date of completion.
4649 (e) Not later than the 30th day after the date the
4750 commissioner receives the board's notice under Subsection (d), the
4851 commissioner shall determine whether the guaranty fund has met its
4952 obligations under the approved revised plan of operation. If the
5053 commissioner determines that the guaranty fund met the fund's
5154 obligations, the commissioner shall issue an order requiring the
5255 distribution of any remaining money in the guaranty fund and trust
5356 fund to qualified groups.
5457 (f) On the 30th day after the date the commissioner issues
5558 the order under Subsection (e):
5659 (1) the guaranty fund and the trust fund are
5760 dissolved; and
5861 (2) the board is abolished.
5962 SECTION 3. Not later than December 1, 2025, the board of
6063 directors of the Texas self-insurance group guaranty fund shall
6164 submit the revised plan of operation to the commissioner of
6265 insurance required by Section 407A.4561, Labor Code, as added by
6366 this Act.
6467 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
68+ * * * * *