Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2658 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 13, 2025
Analysis March 13, 2025
Fiscal Note March 13, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 23, 2025
Witness List April 23, 2025
Analysis April 23, 2025
Fiscal Note April 23, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 22, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 19, 2025
Fiscal Note April 10, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 14, 2025
Analysis April 9, 2025